Global patent index - EP 0922828 A3

EP 0922828 A3 2000-10-25 - Window with additional pane

Title (en)

Window with additional pane

Title (de)

Fenster mit Vorsatzscheibe

Title (fr)

Fenêtre avec survitrage

Publication

EP 0922828 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122589 A

Priority

DE 19755270 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922828A2] The casement frame (4) is attached to the window-frame (2) so as to tilt and or turn, and contains a pane of glass (6) sealed-in on the room-side by an L-shaped cross-sectioned glazing-strip (9) fixed to the casement frame on which a front pane (15) is detachably positioned. The short arm (39) extends beyond the front pane, and holds a holder-strip (42) clipped (43) to the glass pane. The glazing strip acts as support for the front pane which rests against the long arm (44) parallel with the pane of glass. At least one sealing strip (45) fills the space between the glass and holder strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/28; E06B 3/58; E06B 3/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/24 (2006.01); E06B 3/26 (2006.01); E06B 3/28 (2006.01); E06B 3/64 (2006.01); E06B 3/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/2605 (2013.01); E06B 3/24 (2013.01); E06B 3/28 (2013.01); E06B 3/64 (2013.01); E06B 3/58 (2013.01); E06B 2003/2615 (2013.01); E06B 2003/262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922828 A2 19990616; EP 0922828 A3 20001025; DE 19755270 A1 19990701; DE 19755270 B4 20070125

INPADOC legal status

2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-08-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19U

- Effective date: 20010501

2001-07-25 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 19W

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI