Global patent index - EP 0922852 A3

EP 0922852 A3 2000-06-07 - Fuel system

Title (en)

Fuel system

Title (de)

Kraftstoffanlage

Title (fr)

Système de carburant

Publication

EP 0922852 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309693 A

Priority

GB 9726090 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922852A2] A fuel system is described which comprises an injector (12) mounted in a bore of an engine cylinder head (10), a high pressure pipe (30) arranged to supply fuel to the injector (12) from a common rail (32), an end region of the pipe (30) adjacent the injector (12) extending in a direction substantially perpendicular to an axis of the injector (12), and a clamp member (38) arranged to clamp the end region of pipe (30) to the injector (12), the clamp member (38) including a drilling (40) defining a return fuel passage extending between the injector (12) and a backleak channel (44) provided in the cylinder head (10) or a cam box wall or cover (22) of the engine. The injector (12) may be modified to define a flow passage (40) which communicates directly with the backleak channel (44), thus avoiding providing a drilling in the clamp member (38). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14; F02M 55/00; F02M 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 55/02 (2013.01); F02M 55/001 (2013.01); F02M 55/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922852 A2 19990616; EP 0922852 A3 20000607; GB 9726090 D0 19980211

INPADOC legal status

2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001208

2001-03-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02M 61/14 A, 7F 02M 55/00 B, 7F 02M 55/02 B

2000-01-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUCAS INDUSTRIES LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI