Global Patent Index - EP 0922859 A3

EP 0922859 A3 2000-05-17 - Moineau pump

Title (en)

Moineau pump

Title (de)

Exzenterschneckenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe Moineau

Publication

EP 0922859 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121332 A

Priority

DE 19754818 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922859A2] An elastomer is injected into a mold (1,2) so that it only has contact with the helical shell (5) but does not have form an adherent joint with it. The shell is preferably an elongated helical tube without surface treatment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/1075 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49242 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922859 A2 19990616; EP 0922859 A3 20000517; CA 2255376 A1 19990610; DE 19754818 A1 19990617; US 6158988 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070111

2006-08-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030703

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI