Global Patent Index - EP 0922861 A3

EP 0922861 A3 2000-04-12 - Blower unit

Title (en)

Blower unit

Title (de)

Gebläseaggregat

Title (fr)

Unité ventilateur

Publication

EP 0922861 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123097 A

Priority

DE 19755172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922861A2] The blower unit comprises at least one blower wheel driven by a motor. The blower wheel has a hood attached to the housing. The hood consists of a combination of plastics and natural fibers. The hood preferably consists of flax fibers mixed with polypropylene.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/02; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/664 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F05D 2300/43 (2013.01); F05D 2300/603 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922861 A2 19990616; EP 0922861 A3 20000412; DE 19755172 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050414

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI