Global Patent Index - EP 0922862 A3

EP 0922862 A3 2000-04-12 - Axial fan for ventilating systems

Title (en)

Axial fan for ventilating systems

Title (de)

Axialventilator für Lüftungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Ventilateur axial pour systèmes de ventilation

Publication

EP 0922862 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122961 A

Priority

DE 19755615 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0922862A2] An insert ring (12) is fastened on the inside wall of the housing (1) and comprises a material which does not wear in use and which wears during smoke removal. The distance of the tips of the blades (8) from the inside wall of the housing is preferably 0.2-2.0% of the impeller diameter and from the inside of the insert ring is 0-0.5% of the impeller diameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/16; F04D 19/00; F04D 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 19/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/164 (2013.01); F04D 19/002 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F05D 2260/95 (2013.01); F05D 2300/502 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0922862 A2 19990616; EP 0922862 A3 20000412; EP 0922862 B1 20030716; AT 245255 T 20030815; DE 19755615 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: TROX TLT GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 245255 T

- Effective date: 20130910

2013-03-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TROX TLT GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TLT-TURBO GMBH, 66482 ZWEIBRUECKEN, DE

- Document: DE 59809019

- Effective date: 20130111

2012-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT, CH

2012-12-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: TROX TLT GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TLT-TURBO GMBH, DE

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: TLT-TURBO GMBH

2003-10-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-09-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TLT-TURBO GMBH

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809019 P 20030821

2003-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL SE

2003-07-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2003-07-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI NL SE

2000-12-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19981203;SI PAYMENT 19981203

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19981203;SI PAYMENT 19981203

2000-04-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 29/16 A, 7F 04D 19/00 B, 7F 04D 29/02 B

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI NL SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19981203;SI PAYMENT 19981203