Global Patent Index - EP 0923060 A3

EP 0923060 A3 2000-09-06 - Wireless remote control system for electrical devices

Title (en)

Wireless remote control system for electrical devices

Title (de)

Schnurloses Fernbedienungsystem für elektrische Geräten

Title (fr)

Commande à distance sans fil pour appareils électriques

Publication

EP 0923060 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123245 A

Priority

  • US 6965997 P
  • US 17555698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0923060A2] A wireless remote control system for controlling electrical devices includes one or more RF transmittors and RF receivers. The RF receivers are installed along with the electrical device, such as a light fixture, is located and includes a receiver switch for controlling electrical power to the electrical device. RF transmitters are located where remote control switches are desired for the electrical devices to be controlled. The RF transmitters are activated by a transmitter switch, such as a push button or toggle switch or are automatically activated by, for example, a thermostat or an alarm system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02J 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0923060 A2 19990616; EP 0923060 A3 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-06-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 02J 13/00 A

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI