Global Patent Index - EP 0923092 A3

EP 0923092 A3 2000-07-12 - Transformer

Title (en)

Transformer

Title (de)

Transformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur

Publication

EP 0923092 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98204108 A

Priority

DE 19754845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0923092A2] The transformer has a primary winding (2) with a certain stray inductance, magnetically coupled to at least one secondary winding (3) with a given voltage conversion ratio. The primary winding includes at least two winding parts whose magnetic couplings to at least one of the secondary windings are in opposite directions to each other. The two winding parts are substantially decoupled from each other. Independent claims are included for a voltage converter and an electrical apparatus using the transformer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 30/00 (2006.01); H01F 38/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 38/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0923092 A2 19990616; EP 0923092 A3 20000712; DE 19754845 A1 19990617; JP H11243019 A 19990907; US 6100781 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20040404

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY & STANDARDS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI