Global Patent Index - EP 0923154 A3

EP 0923154 A3 2000-10-11 - Method for controlling a phase controlled antenna

Title (en)

Method for controlling a phase controlled antenna

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung einer phasengesteuerten Antenne

Title (fr)

Méthode de contrôle d'une antenne à commande de phase

Publication

EP 0923154 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120652 A

Priority

DE 19750033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19750033A1] The method involves controlling a phase-controlled antenna consisting of transmitter/receiver modules containing a control logic, with which the phase- and amplitude controls in each module are adjusted in a pre-settable way. The control logic is directly connected with only one calibration memory which contains at least all phase- and amplitude correction values for the corresponding module. The method involves controlling a phase-controlled antenna consisting of transmitter/receiver modules, whereby each module contains a control logic, with which the phase- and amplitude controls in each module are adjusted in pre-settable way. The control logic is directly connected with only one calibration memory, which is preferably formed as E<2>PROM in a SOIC casing, and which contains at least all phase- and amplitude correction values for the corresponding module. The phase- and amplitude controls are thereby controlled directly by the control logic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 3/26; H01Q 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/26 (2006.01); H01Q 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/267 (2013.01); H01Q 21/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19750033 A1 19990520; EP 0923154 A2 19990616; EP 0923154 A3 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050816

2006-02-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050817

2005-05-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050405

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AEROSPACE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI