Global Patent Index - EP 0923159 A3

EP 0923159 A3 2001-04-18 - Crimping contact for connecting system

Title (en)

Crimping contact for connecting system

Title (de)

Crimpkontakt für Stecksysteme

Title (fr)

Contact à sertir pour système de connexion

Publication

EP 0923159 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115825 A

Priority

DE 29721752 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0923159A2] The crimp contact has a contact piece (3) coupled via a transition section (4) to a wire crimp (5) for a stripped conductor end, which is followed by a crimp for the conductor insulation. The conductor insulation crimp has a planar base (7) and a pair of cooperating arms (8,9), each having 2 relative hinged sections, bent together around the insulated conductor to provide a rectangular profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29721752 U1 19980212; EP 0923159 A2 19990616; EP 0923159 A3 20010418; EP 0923159 B1 20040128; JP H11238532 A 19990831; US 6059616 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810665 P 20040304

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030522

2002-09-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI