EP 0923420 A4 19990623 -
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 3450196 P 19961226
- US 90069797 A 19970725
- US 9724048 W 19971229
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO9829205A1] The present invention is directed to a process for removing oxidation residue from annealed, cold-rolled stainless steel using abrasive brushes, eliminating the need for pickling the steel. The brushing process also imparts a desired finish upon the steel so that the steel need only be passivated, flattened, slitted and cut to length to be ready for market as a finished product, preferably in the same manufacturing line. The present invention is also directed to a manufacturing line for carrying out the inventive process as well as to a method for increasing the productivity of an existing manufacturing line for production of finished cold-rolled stainless steel by replacing existing pickling tanks with abrasive brushes.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B24B 27/033 (2006.01); B24D 13/10 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); B21B 3/02 (2006.01); B21B 45/04 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B24B 27/033 (2013.01); B24D 13/10 (2013.01); C21D 8/0205 (2013.01); C21D 8/0242 (2013.01); B21B 3/02 (2013.01); B21B 45/04 (2013.01); Y02P 10/20 (2015.11)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] DE 19505324 A1 19960822 - BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK [DE]
- [A] EP 0695808 A1 19960207 - BWG BERGWERK WALZWERK [DE]
- [A] EP 0666143 A1 19950809 - HOTANI KK [JP]
- [A] EP 0299636 A1 19890118 - MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 004 30 April 1996 (1996-04-30)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 066 (C - 271) 26 March 1985 (1985-03-26)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 005 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
- See references of WO 9829205A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9829205 A1 19980709; AU 5904098 A 19980731; EP 0923420 A1 19990623; EP 0923420 A4 19990623
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9724048 W 19971229; AU 5904098 A 19971229; EP 97954639 A 19971229