Global Patent Index - EP 0923426 B1

EP 0923426 B1 2000-11-15 - PROCESSING MACHINE

Title (en)

PROCESSING MACHINE

Title (de)

BEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'USINAGE

Publication

EP 0923426 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941911 A

Priority

  • DE 19631661 A
  • EP 9704237 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19631661A1] This invention concerns a processing machine (1), particularly for panel-shaped workpieces of wood or wood materials, which consists of: one or more processing stations which essentially lie in the same plane; at least one working unit (8, 9, 10) which can travel over the work stations in three axes (X-, Y- and Z-) perpendicular to one another; and, a number of bearing rails (3) upon which the displaceable carriage units (2) are arranged in the plane of the work stations. The bearing rails (3) have electrical and pneumatic supply interfaces (26, 33) for the carriage units (2) and the supply interfaces are arranged linearly along the longitudinal direction of the bearing rail (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 1/00; B25B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 1/00 (2006.01); B23Q 1/01 (2006.01); B23Q 1/28 (2006.01); B23Q 1/38 (2006.01); B23Q 1/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23Q 1/017 (2013.01); B23Q 1/0009 (2013.01); B23Q 1/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631661 A1 19980212; DE 19631661 C2 20000525; AT 197564 T 20001215; EP 0923426 A1 19990623; EP 0923426 B1 20001115; ES 2153687 T3 20010301; JP 2000515437 A 20001121; WO 9805467 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110804

2011-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090805

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2010-10-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090805

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080804

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080821

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060804

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060804

2005-07-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040804

2003-08-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030828

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153687 T3

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197564 T 20001215

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990226

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT