Global Patent Index - EP 0923495 B1

EP 0923495 B1 2000-03-22 - SET OF PARTS FOR RIGIDLY INTERCONNECTING THE CORNERS OF TWO CONTAINERS PROVIDED WITH HOLLOW CORNER FITTINGS, TOOL THEREFORE AND CONTAINER

Title (en)

SET OF PARTS FOR RIGIDLY INTERCONNECTING THE CORNERS OF TWO CONTAINERS PROVIDED WITH HOLLOW CORNER FITTINGS, TOOL THEREFORE AND CONTAINER

Title (de)

BAUSATZ ZUM STARREN VERBINDEN ZWEIER AN IHREN ECKEN MIT HOHLEN ECKBESCHLÄGEN VERSEHENER CONTAINER SOWIE HANDHABUNGSWERKZEUG UND CONTAINER

Title (fr)

JEU DE PIECES DETACHEES POUR LE RACCORDEMENT ANGULAIRE RIGIDE DE DEUX CONTENEURS AUX ANGLES POURVUS D'ARMATURES CREUSES, OUTIL DE MANIPULATION POUR CES PIECES ET CONTENEUR

Publication

EP 0923495 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97941931 A

Priority

  • DE 19632471 A
  • DE 19636294 A
  • DE 19639903 A
  • DE 19652817 A
  • DE 19700678 A
  • DE 19715910 A
  • EP 9704357 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806644A1] A set of parts for rigidly interconnecting two containers provided with hollow corner fittings (4) includes an intermediate element (120) which leaves a predetermined gap between the rigidly interconnected containers, a rod with threaded ends and two hammer head parts (118) both of which may be screwed at either end of the threaded rod and inserted into the corner fittings (4) (14) through oblong holes provided on the surfaces of the corner fittings. Once assembled for rigidly interconnecting the containers, the threaded rod (116) extends through the intermediate element (120), is rotatable from outside the intermediate element and, when rotating, drives the hammer head parts (118) mounted on and inserted in the corner fittings into a superposed position against the intermediate element (120), under the pressure from the corner fitting external side (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 90/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/00 (2006.01); B65D 88/02 (2006.01); B65D 88/12 (2006.01); B65D 90/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/348 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 90/0086 (2013.01); B65D 88/005 (2013.01); B65D 88/022 (2013.01); B65D 88/121 (2013.01); B65D 90/0006 (2013.01); E04B 1/3483 (2013.01); Y10T 24/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806644 A1 19980219; BR 9711197 A 20011106; CN 1072597 C 20011010; CN 1227529 A 19990901; EP 0923495 A1 19990623; EP 0923495 B1 20000322; ID 18016 A 19980219; JP 2000516179 A 20001205; KR 100444824 B1 20040818; KR 20000029936 A 20000525; US 6363586 B1 20020402

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050811

2004-08-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701340 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-08-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SET OF PARTS FOR RIGIDLY INTERCONNECTING THE CORNERS OF TWO CONTAINERS PROVIDED WITH HOLLOW CORNER FITTINGS, TOOL THEREFORE AND CONTAINER

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE