Global Patent Index - EP 0923502 B1

EP 0923502 B1 2001-12-12 - YARN TENSIONING DEVICE AND YARN FEEDING DEVICE

Title (en)

YARN TENSIONING DEVICE AND YARN FEEDING DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM BREMSEN EINES FADENS UND FADENLIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LE FREINAGE D'UN FIL ET FOURNISSEUR

Publication

EP 0923502 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97944805 A

Priority

  • DE 19634972 A
  • EP 9704698 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19634972A1] A device (B) for tensioning a yarn (Y) has a stationary storage body (S) for a yarn supply (4) with a rotationally symmetrical unreel surface (6), a truncated flexible braking band (T) approximately coaxial to the unreel surface (6) and axially stressed with a continuous braking surface (22) in the circumferential direction against the unreel surface (6), and an elastic ring-shaped membrane (R) made of an elastomer or rubber which at its end area with the smallest diameter is joined in a force-transmitting manner to the braking band (T) and which at its end area with the largest diameter is supported in an outer ring holder (11). The end area of the ring-shaped membrane (R) with the smallest diameter is bent inwards towards the unreel surface (6) and is joined there to the braking band (T).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22; D03D 47/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/364 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19634972 A1 19980305; CN 1087707 C 20020717; CN 1233226 A 19991027; EP 0923502 A1 19990623; EP 0923502 B1 20011212; KR 100333101 B1 20020422; KR 20000035928 A 20000626; US 6125892 A 20001003; WO 9808767 A1 19980305

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130828

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705792 20020124

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010124

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990210

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE