Global Patent Index - EP 0923591 A4

EP 0923591 A4 2001-01-31 - NOVEL BORONIC ACID-CONTAINING NUCLEIC ACIDS AND THEIR USE AS DIAGNOSTIC AGENTS

Title (en)

NOVEL BORONIC ACID-CONTAINING NUCLEIC ACIDS AND THEIR USE AS DIAGNOSTIC AGENTS

Title (de)

NEUE BORSAEURE-HALTIGE NUKLEINSAEUREN UND IHRE ANWENDUNG ALS DIAGNOSTISCHE MITTEL

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE BORIQUE ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME AGENTS DIAGNOSTIQUES

Publication

EP 0923591 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97935061 A

Priority

  • US 9712834 W
  • US 69242996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5876938A] Modified nucleotides and polynucleotides which are useful in hybridization assays for the detection of target genes are provided. The modified polynucleotides contain at least one boronic acid moiety which is attached to a nucleotide base in a position which does not interfere with the hydrogen bonding capabilities of that base during duplex formation. The modified polynucleotides are typically formed from naturally occurring nucleotides and one or more modified nucleotides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 1/00; C07G 3/00; C07H 15/00; C07H 19/00; C07H 21/02; C07H 23/00; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C07H 19/06 (2006.01); C07H 19/10 (2006.01); C07H 19/14 (2006.01); C07H 19/16 (2006.01); C07H 19/20 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 23/00 (2006.01); C12P 19/34 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 23/00 (2013.01); C07H 21/00 (2013.01); C12P 19/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5876938 A 19990302; AU 3809097 A 19980225; AU 729907 B2 20010215; CA 2262618 A1 19980212; CA 2262618 C 20071002; EP 0923591 A1 19990623; EP 0923591 A4 20010131; JP 2000515546 A 20001121; US 5831045 A 19981103; US 5831046 A 19981103; WO 9805672 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090804

2008-12-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LONZA ROCKLAND, INC.

2005-12-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMBREX BIO SCIENCE ROCKLAND, INC.

2005-09-21 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20051102

2004-06-23 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20030327

2004-06-23 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040901

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021016

2001-01-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07H 1/00 A, 7C 07G 3/00 B, 7C 07H 15/00 B, 7C 07H 19/00 B, 7C 07H 21/02 B, 7C 07H 23/00 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990303

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE