Global Patent Index - EP 0923698 B1

EP 0923698 B1 2001-12-12 - A STOVE WITH SOLID FUEL, WORKING AS A BOILER FOR A HEATING SYSTEM

Title (en)

A STOVE WITH SOLID FUEL, WORKING AS A BOILER FOR A HEATING SYSTEM

Title (de)

EIN OFEN FÜR FESTEN BRENNSTOFF, WELCHER ALS BOILER FÜR EIN HEIZSYSTEM DIENT

Title (fr)

FOURNEAU A COMBUSTIBLE SOLIDE FONCTIONNANT COMME UNE CHAUDIERE POUR SERVIR DE SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE

Publication

EP 0923698 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923055 A

Priority

  • IT 9800129 W
  • IT RM970315 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854515A1] A stove with solid fuel, working as a boiler for a heating system, comprising a shell (1) ending up at the top in a connection (11) tapered in the flue and showing, inside said shell (1) provided with a wing (3), a furnace (2) and above said furnace (2) and in free communication with the latter a first heat exchanger (5) with a sheaf of pipes with horizontal development, whereby the heat exchanger (5) is closed in front by a removable wing (6) and supported at its ends by sliding and resting guides (8), which are linked inside said shell (1) along its circumference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24B 1/183; F24B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/183 (2006.01); F24B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24B 1/183 (2013.01); F24B 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854515 A1 19981203; DE 69802895 D1 20020124; DE 69802895 T2 20020822; EP 0923698 A1 19990623; EP 0923698 B1 20011212; ES 2169914 T3 20020716; IT 1293030 B1 19990211; IT RM970315 A1 19981127; IT RM970315 D0 19970527

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120523

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120522

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802895

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120522

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169914 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802895 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000711

1999-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE