Global Patent Index - EP 0923753 A4

EP 0923753 A4 2000-10-04 - KITCHEN ENSEMBLE HAVING WINDOWS WITH CONTROLLABLE OPACITY

Title (en)

KITCHEN ENSEMBLE HAVING WINDOWS WITH CONTROLLABLE OPACITY

Title (de)

KÜCHENEINRICHTUNG MIT VERGLASUNG MIT REGELBARER DURCHSICHTIGKEIT

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE CUISINE DOTE DE FENETRES A OPACITE REGULABLE

Publication

EP 0923753 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96945208 A

Priority

US 9620033 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/06; A47L 15/42; F25D 23/02; E06B 9/24; G09F 9/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47F 3/06 (2006.01); A47L 15/42 (2006.01); E06B 9/24 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01); G02F 1/13 (2006.01); G02F 1/1333 (2006.01); G09F 9/35 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GB 2098374 A 19821117 - BODE & CO GEB
  • [X] GB 2240686 A 19910807 - HILLEN SEAN
  • [A] WO 9415785 A1 19940721 - POLYMAGE SARL [FR], et al
  • [A] US 4649432 A 19870310 - WATANABE YUJI [JP], et al
  • [X] WO 8403577 A1 19840913 - BOBAK TADEUSZ
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 574 (M - 1498) 19 October 1993 (1993-10-19)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 06 31 July 1995 (1995-07-31)
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 242 (M - 1259) 3 June 1992 (1992-06-03)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 02 28 February 1997 (1997-02-28)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 07 31 March 1998 (1998-03-31)
  • See also references of WO 9828657A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 1463697 A 19980717; EP 0923753 A1 19990623; EP 0923753 A4 20001004

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1022022

2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021009

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010206

2000-10-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47F 3/06 A, 7A 47L 15/42 B, 7F 25D 23/02 B, 7E 06B 9/24 B, 7G 09F 9/35 B

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 02F 1/1333 A, 7A 47F 3/06 B, 7A 47L 15/42 B, 7F 25D 23/02 B, 7E 06B 5/00 B

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990310

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE