Global Patent Index - EP 0923781 B1

EP 0923781 B1 2001-12-05 - METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A RARE EARTH ELEMENT (RE)-Fe-B PERMANENT MAGNET

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A RARE EARTH ELEMENT (RE)-Fe-B PERMANENT MAGNET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SE-Fe-B-DAUERMAGNETEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN AIMANT PERMANENT CONSTITUE D'UN ELEMENT DES TERRES RARES, DE Fe ET DE B

Publication

EP 0923781 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97939966 A

Priority

  • DE 9701787 W
  • DE 19636283 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19636283A1] Disclosed is a new mixture of binding alloys for the manufacture of SE2Fe14B permanent magnets, which are composed of SE6(Fe,Co)13-xGa1+x and SE2Co3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/053 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/00 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); H01F 1/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/0577 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19636283 A1 19980312; EP 0923781 A1 19990623; EP 0923781 B1 20011205; JP 2000503811 A 20000328; JP 3145417 B2 20010312; KR 20000068481 A 20001125; WO 9810438 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705687

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080819

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080819

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705687 20020117

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

2001-02-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A RARE EARTH ELEMENT (RE)-FE-B PERMANENT MAGNET

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990219

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT