Global Patent Index - EP 0923794 B1

EP 0923794 B1 2000-11-15 - ELECTRIC CABLE END PROVIDED WITH A FILTER

Title (en)

ELECTRIC CABLE END PROVIDED WITH A FILTER

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE KABELABSCHLUSSANORDNUNG MIT FILTER

Title (fr)

TERMINAISON DE CABLE ELECTRIQUE MUNIE D'UN FILTRE

Publication

EP 0923794 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97938941 A

Priority

  • FR 9701517 W
  • FR 9610677 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2753014A1] The invention concerns an electric cable end provided with a filter. In a preferred embodiment, the end of the cable (20) is not coated. The two isolated conductors (24, 26) pass through a ferromagnetic material (32). The end part of the coating and the ferromagnetic piece (32) are covered with an insulating material (38).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/719

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/719 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7197 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2753014 A1 19980306; FR 2753014 B1 19981120; DE 69703555 D1 20001221; DE 69703555 T2 20010621; EP 0923794 A1 19990623; EP 0923794 B1 20001115; WO 9810491 A1 19980312

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170821

2017-09-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170821

2017-08-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69703555

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160808

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703555 20001221

2000-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990728

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990218

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB