Global patent index - EP 0923995 A3

EP 0923995 A3 2000-03-08 - Method for curing coating films by different radiations

Title (en)

Method for curing coating films by different radiations

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Härten von Lackschichten mit verschiedenen Bestrahlungen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour durcir des couches de laque par radiations différentes

Publication

EP 0923995 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123020 A

Priority

DE 19754621 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0923995A2] Radiation cured polyacrylate oligomer coatings e.g. copolymers of polyurethane, polyester, polyether and epoxy acrylates on wood substrates are exposed to an infra red radiation beam, wavelength 10.6 microns , from a carbon dioxide laser, to raise the temperature of the 20-250 microns coating layer to 160-220 degrees C. Addition of 5-10 % wt. polyethylene wax and 3-7 % wt. silica can be made to the lacquer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/02 (2006.01); B05D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 3/068 (2013.01); B05D 3/0263 (2013.01); B05D 3/06 (2013.01); B05D 3/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754621 A1 19990610; DE 19754621 C2 20020321; EP 0923995 A2 19990623; EP 0923995 A3 20000308

INPADOC legal status

2004-04-28 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030210

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI