Global Patent Index - EP 0924004 A3

EP 0924004 A3 2000-03-15 - Method and machine for shaping the edges of bent pieces

Title (en)

Method and machine for shaping the edges of bent pieces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Maschine zum Formen der Kanten von gebogenen Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine de formage de bords de pièces cintrées

Publication

EP 0924004 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123722 A

Priority

IT MI972777 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924004A2] A method and a machine for shaping the edges (12, 13) of a roll bent metal piece (10), more particularly tubular or annular members (10) from a metal sheet or a sectional bar; the flat or non-curved longitudinal edges (12, 13) of the roll bent metal piece (10) are subjected to a roll shaping step of making it move forwards with one or both edges (12, 13) clamped between opposing shaping elements (25, 26); the shaping elements are rotatably supported to act on the internal and on the external surfaces respectively of the bent piece (10) in order to provide the flat edges (12,13) of the same bent piece (10) with the required circular shape. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/06; B21C 37/08; B21D 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/06 (2006.01); B21C 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/0822 (2013.01); B21C 37/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924004 A2 19990623; EP 0924004 A3 20000315; IT 1296977 B1 19990803; IT MI972777 A1 19990616

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 37/06 A, 7B 21C 37/08 B, 7B 21D 5/12 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI