Global Patent Index - EP 0924007 A3

EP 0924007 A3 2000-03-08 - Method and device for cutting wire into sections of predetermined length

Title (en)

Method and device for cutting wire into sections of predetermined length

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Abscheiden von Drahtstücken vorgegebener Länge von einem Draht sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de coupage de fil en tronçons de longeurs prédéterminées

Publication

EP 0924007 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123885 A

Priority

DE 19756665 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924007A2] The wire cutting machine prepares lengths of wire e.g. for welding into a reinforcing mat for poured concrete. It has a wire feed with a sensing system to measure the feed speed. A drive motor is linked to contrarotating cutting discs (5,5a) each of which is fitted with a cutting blade (2,2a) between which the wire is cut. The cutting speed can be regulated to provide wire lengths in discrete lengths, with a fine adjustment to the length by varying the relative timing of the cutting discs and the wire feed. The wire is provided with a surface texture before cutting, to improve the grip in the set concrete.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 11/00; B23D 25/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924007 A2 19990623; EP 0924007 A3 20000308; EP 0924007 B1 20030604; AT 242069 T 20030615; DE 19756665 A1 19990701; ES 2196472 T3 20031216

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141216

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141216

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242069 T

- Effective date: 20141216

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808614

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131102

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-12-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2011-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GSG GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: GSG GMBH & CO. KG#AUF DER HOFESTATT 7#58239 SCHWERTE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GSG GMBH & CO. KG#AUF DER HOFESTATT 7#58239 SCHWERTE (DE)

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196472 T3

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808614 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-06-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR CUTTING WIRE INTO SECTIONS OF PREDETERMINED LENGTH

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21F 11/00 A, 7B 23D 25/12 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI