Global Patent Index - EP 0924036 A3

EP 0924036 A3 2000-05-03 - Punching apparatus for producing mitred cuts in a resilient material

Title (en)

Punching apparatus for producing mitred cuts in a resilient material

Title (de)

Stanzwerkzeug zum Anbringen von Gehrungsschnitten in elastisches Material

Title (fr)

Emporte-pièce pour effectuer une découpe oblique dans un matériau élastique

Publication

EP 0924036 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123613 A

Priority

DE 19756047 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924036A2] The cutting or stamping tool (1) forms shaped slots in the edges of elastic material e.g. insulating foam. It has a scissors action with one jaw fitted with a support surface (4) to hold the material and with one jaw fitted with the shaped cutter (8). The support surface has a rear lip (10) to locate the material and with spikes (12) which grip into the material and hold it for cutting or stamping. The slot shape can have corresponding edges which lock into each other to curve the material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/36; B26F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26F 1/12 (2006.01); B26F 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/36 (2013.01); B26D 7/01 (2013.01); B26F 1/12 (2013.01); B26F 2001/365 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924036 A2 19990623; EP 0924036 A3 20000503; DE 19756047 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI