Global Patent Index - EP 0924052 A3

EP 0924052 A3 2000-08-09 - Method and apparatus for lining tubular articles and lined tubular assembly

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for lining tubular articles and lined tubular assembly

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auskleiden von rohrförmigen Artikeln und ausgekleidete Rohre

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour revêtir des tubes et tubes revêtus

Publication

EP 0924052 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98305822 A

Priority

US 99267797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924052A2] A lined tubular assembly and a method and apparatus for lining an elongated tubular article to form the assembly. The lined tubular assembly has a metal tube with a non-metallic liner bonded to the internal surface thereof by a bonding agent. A non-metallic flanged end piece is secured to each end of the metal tube and has a first portion extending into the tube between the liner and the internal surface of the tube and a second portion covering the end surface of the tube. The method for producing the assembly includes introducing simultaneously into the tubular article both a tubular liner and a bonding agent for bonding the liner to the internal surface of the tubular article. The apparatus for producing the assembly includes an elongated liner installation device that simultaneously introduces the liner and bonding agent to the interior of the tubular article. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B29C 63/34; B05B 3/10; F16L 9/147; B65D 59/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/14 (2006.01); B05B 13/06 (2006.01); B29C 63/34 (2006.01); F16L 55/165 (2006.01); F16L 55/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 63/34 (2013.01); B05B 1/14 (2013.01); B05B 13/0636 (2013.01); F16L 55/165 (2013.01); F16L 55/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924052 A2 19990623; EP 0924052 A3 20000809; EP 0924052 B1 20030219; AR 013247 A1 20001213; AT 232788 T 20030315; BR 9803751 A 19991123; CA 2244360 A1 19990617; CA 2244360 C 20030708; DE 69811466 D1 20030327; DE 69811466 T2 20040115; DK 0924052 T3 20030526; ES 2193476 T3 20031101; ID 22204 A 19990916; MY 117779 A 20040830; NO 329407 B1 20101011; NO 983276 A 19990618; NO 983276 D0 19980715; PT 924052 E 20030731; SA 967 B1 20060703; SG 68065 A1 19991019; US 5964981 A 19991012; US 6294042 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100721

2010-10-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TUBOSCOPE VETCO INTERNATIONAL INC.

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050722

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060202

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-01-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-08-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2005-07-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050722

2005-07-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-07-10 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050710

2004-09-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040916

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-17 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20040817

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-06 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-03 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040803

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040803

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040803

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-02 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-02 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20040802

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040729

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193476 T3

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-26 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-04-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401139

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811466 P 20030327

2003-03-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR LINING AN ELONGATED TUBULAR ARTICLES AND USE OF THIS APPARATUS TO PRODUCE A LINED TUBULAR ARTICLE

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 29C 63/34 A, 7B 05B 3/10 B, 7F 16L 9/147 B, 7B 65D 59/02 B

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981218

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI