Global Patent Index - EP 0924066 A3

EP 0924066 A3 2000-03-15 - Adjustable drive for a sheet processing machine, especially a sheet-fed rotary printing press

Title (en)

Adjustable drive for a sheet processing machine, especially a sheet-fed rotary printing press

Title (de)

Verstellbarer Antrieb für eine Bogen verarbeitende Maschine, insbesondere eine Bogen-Rotationsdruckmaschine

Title (fr)

Entraînement réglable pour une machine à traiter des feuilles, notamment une presse rotative à feuilles

Publication

EP 0924066 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123950 A

Priority

  • DE 29722559 U
  • DE 29722735 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924066A2] At least three swivel gearwheels (2-4) are provided between the drive gearwheel (1) and output gearwheel (14). A swivel gear wheel (3) is mounted on a swing bar (5) to swivel about a further gearwheel (2). A spring drive with different thread engages on the swing bar and the drive is mounted in a swivel holding plate (11). The spindle drive has a spring (10) engaging in a threaded bore of the holding plate (11), a spindle nut connection (7,8) coupled with the swing bar and a gearwheel (9) in connection with both the spindle and the spindle nut connection. The gearwheel is biased by a servo drive and the thread pitches of the spindle and spindle nut connection are different.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/008 (2006.01); B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 21/12 (2006.01); B65H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B41F 13/008 (2013.01); B41F 21/12 (2013.01); B65H 3/00 (2013.01); B65H 2403/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924066 A2 19990623; EP 0924066 A3 20000315; EP 0924066 B1 20030312; AT 234198 T 20030315

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051217

2005-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2005-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2004-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041213

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041206

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807462 P 20030417

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KEMMERER, KLEMENS

1999-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAYER, HARALD

1999-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOELL, ROLAND

1999-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BAESEL, UWE DR.

1999-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIEBISCH, WOLFGANG

1999-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MATTHAEUS, WOLFGANG

1999-07-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ULLRICH, BERND

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI