Global Patent Index - EP 0924069 B1

EP 0924069 B1 2001-12-19 - Sheet guiding device in a printing machine

Title (en)

Sheet guiding device in a printing machine

Title (de)

Bogenführungseinrichtung in einer Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de guidage de feuilles dans une machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0924069 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121740 A

Priority

DE 29721185 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924069A2] The system comprises a printing-block and guide cylinders with a gap between through which is supplied air pressing the sheets against their surface. A housing (17) containing an air chamber (13) has in its guiding surface (19) a large number of nozzles (15) forming ball-joints with it. Each nozzle has an opening at one end connected to the chamber, while discharging an air jet from the other so as to prevent the sheets from lifting off the guide cylinder (10). The guide surface forms with the guide cylinder an inlet gap (23) tapering in the travel direction (8) towards the gap (12) between the cylinders and in which printing takes place.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/00; B41F 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/00 (2006.01); B41F 25/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 25/00 (2013.01); B41F 21/00 (2013.01); B65H 29/52 (2013.01); B65H 2406/00 (2013.01); B65H 2406/11325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29721185 U1 19980115; AT 211064 T 20020115; EP 0924069 A2 19990623; EP 0924069 A3 19990630; EP 0924069 B1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-11-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031116

2004-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-11-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031116

2003-11-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031116

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021104

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021029

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-10-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021028

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802522 20020131

2002-01-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211064 T 20020115

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-03-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT SE

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990609

1999-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI