Global Patent Index - EP 0924105 A3

EP 0924105 A3 2001-04-04 - Holder for a tool

Title (en)

Holder for a tool

Title (de)

Halter für ein Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Porte-outil pour un outil

Publication

EP 0924105 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204154 A

Priority

BE 9701032 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924105A2] Holder (1) for a tool (15), provided for being so attached to a wall of the receptacle (13) that the tool (15) can be borne by the holder (1) in a position for use whereby at least one part (17) of it is above an opening (18) of the receptacle (13), while the holder (1) leaves free the space above and in the opening (18), so that the holder (1), contrary to known holders, does not prevent a lid (14) from being placed on the opening (18). The holder (1) preferably comprises a plate-shaped body (2) of flexible material, which can be brought into a curved position whereby two areas of the body (2) which each comprise an opening (3), (4) provided at a distance apart from each other so that the openings (3), (4) form, a passage in which the tool can be held, and which can be attached to a receptacle in this curved position. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44D 3/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924105 A2 19990623; EP 0924105 A3 20010404; BE 1011623 A6 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011005

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI