Global Patent Index - EP 0924324 B1

EP 0924324 B1 2002-09-04 - Apparatus for the supervision of yarns on ring spinning machines

Title (en)

Apparatus for the supervision of yarns on ring spinning machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ueberwachung von Garnen an Ringspinnmaschinen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la surveillance de fils sur métiers à filer à anneau

Publication

EP 0924324 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98122732 A

Priority

CH 289097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924324A1] A traveling sensor (1) moves along a track (4) past the spinning positions. An optical transducer (2) provides a signal for the interruption or reflection of a light beam by the yarn (15) as it passes by in the rotating balloon (16). The duration of the signal is evaluated to indicate statistical outliers in diameter or other irregularities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/14; D01H 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/06 (2006.01); D01H 13/14 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01); D01H 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/165 (2013.01); D01H 13/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924324 A1 19990623; EP 0924324 B1 20020904; CN 1154759 C 20040623; CN 1230608 A 19991006; DE 59805401 D1 20021010; JP H11269729 A 19991005; US 6112508 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Free text: ZELLWEGER LUWA AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH) -TRANSFER TO- USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG#WILSTRASSE 11#8610 USTER (CH)

2003-03-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805401 20021010

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011105

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991223

2000-03-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI