Global Patent Index - EP 0924331 A3

EP 0924331 A3 2000-01-19 - Safety circuit for a heating circuit of a washing machine, dishwasher or drier

Title (en)

Safety circuit for a heating circuit of a washing machine, dishwasher or drier

Title (de)

Sicherung in der Heizschaltung einer Waschmaschine ,einer Geschirrspülmaschine oder eines Trockners

Title (fr)

Sécurité sur le circuit de chauffage d'une machine à laver le linge ou la vaisselle ou d'un sèche-linge

Publication

EP 0924331 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98122364 A

Priority

DE 19755089 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924331A2] The invention relates to a safety circuit for a heating circuit of a washing machine or dishwasher or of a drier, wherein the heating circuit includes a series connection comprising heating switching contact, heating resistor and safety switch, and wherein a monitoring arrangement monitors the heating circuit for faults and, in the event of a fault, causes the heating circuit or the machine to be switched-off. The operational reliability of the heating circuit is easily improved as a result of the potentials at the junctions between the heating switching contact and heating resistor and/or between the heating resistor and safety switch being supplied to a logic circuit which, only when the potential conditions in the heating circuit are correct, issues no fault signal to switch-off the heating circuit or the machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); D06F 39/04 (2006.01); D06F 58/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4285 (2013.01); D06F 39/04 (2013.01); D06F 58/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924331 A2 19990623; EP 0924331 A3 20000119; EP 0924331 B1 20060712; DE 19755089 A1 19990624; DE 19755089 C2 20030703; DE 69835195 D1 20060824

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121125

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101120

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-02-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69835195 P 20060824

2006-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-07-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-07-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060712

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020325

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI