Global Patent Index - EP 0924339 A3

EP 0924339 A3 2000-04-19 - Steam-heated roller

Title (en)

Steam-heated roller

Title (de)

Dampfbeheizte Walze

Title (fr)

Rouleau chauffé à la vapeur

Publication

EP 0924339 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122080 A

Priority

  • DE 19756152 A
  • DE 19809080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924339A2] The steam heated roller assembly has a pump system (12) to pump out any condensation. The pump (12) does not move in relation to the roller (1), at one end of the roller (1). The pump system (12) has at least one pump, with an external drive which operates through the roller rotation and a static drive take-off (24). The drive has a return setting unit. The pump is a piston pump with an inlet control edge and/or outlet control edge at the piston. The pump system (12) has a peripheral surface around it, and the external drive mechanism acts on the pump through a drive surface which, peripherally, is at a variable gap from the pump. The drive surface movement speed matches the surface speed of the pump system (12). The drive surface is the peripheral surface of a wheel (24), powered by a torque transmission link with the rotating roller (1). The drive surface can also be a belt, passing partially round the pump system (12) and partially round an external deflection roller. The pump system can contain at least one rotary pump, with an external drive, with the pump inlet and outlet separated by the pump drive. Upon rotation, the drive passes through a working zone with a chamber with a constant volume which moves from the pump inlet to the pump outlet. The rotary pump has a rotary paddle wheel or a rotary pump unit. The drive is operated by the rotation of the roller against a static drive unit using a drive wheel in torque-transmission contact with a counter wheel in a positive or friction fit grip, on an axis matching the roller axis. The counter wheel has no rotation to the bearing housing of the roller, or it has rotation against the bearing housing with a steam drive. The steam drive is a turbine, with a hot steam flow for its rotation, with torque-transmission contact with the drive wheel. The roller is heated by a number of peripheral channels. The pump system (12) is linked to the heating channels through a condensation channel at a radial outer wall of the heating system. Each heating channel leads to a common end chamber, where condensation is collected, to pass out to the pump through the condensation channel. The collection chamber has a ring shape, connecting the ends of all the heating channels. The condensation channel extends radially outwards and upwards to the pump. The pump is connected to an outflow pipe through a non-return valve, with a connecting pipe through the roller journal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02; D21F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/10 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/10 (2013.01); D21G 1/0266 (2013.01); F28F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924339 A2 19990623; EP 0924339 A3 20000419; EP 0924339 B1 20030507; DE 19809080 A1 19990923; DE 19809080 C2 20030814; US 6128827 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061121

2005-11-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808252

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-06-12

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2003-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030507

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020415

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI