Global Patent Index - EP 0924359 A3

EP 0924359 A3 2000-11-08 - Manufacturing method for prefabricated wall elements for the construction of buildings, and means for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Manufacturing method for prefabricated wall elements for the construction of buildings, and means for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von vorgefertigten Wandelementen für die Errichtung von Bauwerken sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'éléments muraux préfabriqués pour la construction de bâtiments et moyens pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0924359 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890311 A

Priority

AT 212097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924359A2] Bricks are built up to storey-height wall elements and at least one mat (23) of a tensile material such as a glass fiber mat, carbon mat, plastics mat or slag mat is applied to at least one surface of the wall elements by an adhesive layer (22). The individual bricks (21) are staggered one above the other on a contact bearing face (12) which is slightly inclined to the vertical and the mat of tensile material is applied to the opposite surface of the bearing face. Hollow blocks with reinforcements in the cavities can be used as the bricks. Independent claim describes frame for building up wall elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/02; E04C 2/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/02 (2006.01); E04B 2/00 (2006.01); E04B 2/04 (2006.01); E04B 2/06 (2006.01); E04C 2/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 2/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924359 A2 19990623; EP 0924359 A3 20001108; AT 405954 B 20000125; AT A212097 A 19990515; CZ 9804038 A3 19990714; HU 9802907 A2 20010228; HU 9802907 A3 20030328; HU 9802907 D0 19990201; SK 167398 A3 20000313

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021118

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE IT NL

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 2/02 A, 7E 04C 2/04 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI