Global Patent Index - EP 0924360 A3

EP 0924360 A3 2000-10-25 - Concrete floor structure

Title (en)

Concrete floor structure

Title (de)

Stahlbeton-Deckenbauelement

Title (fr)

Structure de plancher en béton

Publication

EP 0924360 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123655 A

Priority

SE 9704681 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924360A2] A factory-made construction element for a system of joists (10), multiple construction elements being designed to be placed adjacent to each other on a framework. A layer of light clinker concrete (11) is provided between a first concrete layer (12) and a second concrete layer (16), and an elongate reinforcement member (13) extends in a longitudinal direction through the construction element between the concrete layers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/02; E04B 5/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924360 A2 19990623; EP 0924360 A3 20001025; NO 312041 B1 20020304; NO 985861 A 19990616; NO 985861 D0 19981214; PL 330339 A1 19990621; SE 511080 C2 19990802; SE 9704681 D0 19971215; SE 9704681 L 19990616

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020905

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FI FR GB

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 5/02 A, 7E 04B 5/48 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI