Global Patent Index - EP 0924373 B1

EP 0924373 B1 2002-09-18 - Espagnolette lock for a door, french window or similar

Title (en)

Espagnolette lock for a door, french window or similar

Title (de)

Treibstangenschloss für eine Tür, Fenstertür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Crémone-serrure pour porte, porte-fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 0924373 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98440288 A

Priority

FR 9716555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924373A1] The system consists of a housing (2) containing a control mechanism (3) with an actuator (4) for one or more long bolts (5, 5A) and a key-actuated component (12) which governs a locking mechanism (13) holding the long bolts in their locked position. The locking mechanism comprises a catch (14) which is operated by the key-actuated component to cooperate in its locked position with a rack (15) associated directly or indirectly with the long bolts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/042 (2013.01); E05C 9/047 (2013.01); E05B 15/0046 (2013.01); Y10T 70/5226 (2015.04); Y10T 70/523 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0843 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924373 A1 19990623; EP 0924373 B1 20020918; DE 69808030 D1 20021024; DE 69808030 T2 20030430; FR 2772821 A1 19990625; FR 2772821 B1 20000218; US 6209364 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061208

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061208

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808030 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020228

2000-03-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

1999-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI