Global Patent Index - EP 0924374 A3

EP 0924374 A3 2007-10-03 - Monitoring device, in particular for window or similar openable and closeable systems

Title (en)

Monitoring device, in particular for window or similar openable and closeable systems

Title (de)

Überwachungseinrichtung, insbesondere für Fenster oder dergleichen öffen- und schliessbare Systeme

Title (fr)

Dispositif de surveillance, en particulier pour fenêtre ou système à ouverture et fermeture similaire

Publication

EP 0924374 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123444 A

Priority

DE 29722556 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924374A2] The monitoring device has a contact transmitter (14) and sensor each set in profiled recesses and provided with noses for engaging behind the rear-cut projections of the recesses. At least one of the noses is movable and is set spring-elastic in the transmitter or sensor body. The movable nose can be formed by a screw tip (21). A cable channel is formed in the sensor body.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01); E05B 45/06 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01); E05D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 45/06 (2013.01); E05B 17/22 (2013.01); E05C 9/066 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0069 (2013.01); E05D 5/0238 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29722556 U1 19980305; EP 0924374 A2 19990623; EP 0924374 A3 20071003

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090620

2009-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090209

2008-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB LI

2008-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080401

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-10-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI