Global patent index - EP 0924384 A3

EP 0924384 A3 2000-08-23 - Airfoil with leading edge cooling

Title (en)

Airfoil with leading edge cooling

Title (de)

Kühlung der Anströmkante einer Turbomaschinenschaufel

Title (fr)

Refroidissement de l'arête amont d'une aube pour une turbomachine

Publication

EP 0924384 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98310191 A

Priority

US 99232397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924384A2] A hollow airfoil (16) is provided which includes a body, a trench (30), and a plurality of cooling apertures (36) disposed within the trench (30). The body extends chordwise between a leading edge (26) and a trailing edge (29), and spanwise between an outer radial surface and an inner radial surface, and includes an exterior wall surrounding a cavity (20). The trench (30) is disposed in the exterior wall along the leading edge (26), extending in a spanwise direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2240/121 (2013.01); F05D 2240/303 (2013.01); F05D 2260/202 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924384 A2 19990623; EP 0924384 A3 20000823; JP H11247611 A 19990914

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020830

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI