Global Patent Index - EP 0924388 A3

EP 0924388 A3 2000-08-16 - System to keep the blade tip clearance in a gas turbine constant

Title (en)

System to keep the blade tip clearance in a gas turbine constant

Title (de)

System zur Konstanthatung des Schaufelspitzenspiels bei einer Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Système pour maintenir le jeu des extrémités des aubes d'une turbine à gaz à constant

Publication

EP 0924388 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121690 A

Priority

DE 19756734 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924388A2] The tips (6a) of the blades are enclosed by ring segments (5) hanging in the turbine housing with a gap (s) controlled in width by a tempering channel system to which an air stream (8) is supplied which is conveyed by the compressor part of the turbine past the combustion chamber. A diaphragm ring (11) closes the measuring bores (7b) more or less in dependence on the temperature of the air stream (8) which is bought up to same. A fraction of the hot gas flowing through the guide vanes (4) and rotor blades (2) can pass through a gap (13) between the stator ring (10) and ring segments (5) at least with a low turbine load, and into the ring chamber (7a) and into the rear area of the turbine, seen in the flow direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/24; F01D 1/16; F01D 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/18 (2006.01); F01D 11/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/24 (2013.01); F01D 11/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924388 A2 19990623; EP 0924388 A3 20000816; EP 0924388 B1 20030924; DE 19756734 A1 19990624; US 6126390 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101113

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809709

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59809709

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101113

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809709 P 20031030

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01D 11/24 A, 7F 01D 1/16 B, 7F 01D 11/18 B

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI