Global patent index - EP 0924395 A3

EP 0924395 A3 2000-07-12 - Method of manufacturing an electromagnetic actuator

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing an electromagnetic actuator

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines elektromagnetischen Aktuators

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un vérin électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0924395 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123153 A

Priority

DE 19757169 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924395A2] Electromagnetic actuator production involves combined surface hardening of an armature (1) and a ram (2). In production of an electromagnetic actuator having one or more electromagnets (3, 4) for moving an armature (1) connected to a ram (2), the armature (1) and the ram (2) are hardened in a common surface treatment step. Preferred Feature: The surface treatment involves coating the components with a wear resistant titanium nitride layer (9) or introducing nitrogen into the component surfaces, especially by plasma nitriding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04; H01F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); H01F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/08 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924395 A2 19990623; EP 0924395 A3 20000712; DE 19757169 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status

2001-12-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010113

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEMIC TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRONIC GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI