Global Patent Index - EP 0924413 A3

EP 0924413 A3 2000-05-10 - Intermediate cable for carburettors

Title (en)

Intermediate cable for carburettors

Title (de)

Zwischenkabel für Vergaser

Title (fr)

Cable intermédiaire pour carburateurs

Publication

EP 0924413 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98500273 A

Priority

ES 9702606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924413A2] "INTERMEDIATE CABLE FOR CARBURETTORS" of the type used in motorcycles and mopeds characterised in that said intermediate cable has a connection head (2) in its lower end which is attached to the carburettor cylinder and on the other end has a female connector (3) for the traditional cable, being encased in a metal support tube (4) with a fixed end screw (6) to be joined to a tensor or sliding cover (7) and placing between the metal support tube (4) and the intermediate cable (1) a plastic protective covering (5) for the cable (1), while the traditional cable connected directly to the accelerator lever is provided with a male connection head (9) to join it to the female head (3) of intermediate cable (1), and having in its end a cover stop with an elastic ring (8) of the sliding cover (7). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/02 (2006.01); F16C 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924413 A2 19990623; EP 0924413 A3 20000510; EP 0924413 B1 20021106; AT 227395 T 20021115; DE 69809180 D1 20021212; ES 2147502 A1 20000901; ES 2147502 B1 20010301; JP H11247833 A 19990914; TW 430824 B 20010421

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-02-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809180 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001109

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227395 T 20021115

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001109

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI