Global Patent Index - EP 0924413 B1

EP 0924413 B1 2002-11-06 - Intermediate cable for carburettors

Title (en)

Intermediate cable for carburettors

Title (de)

Zwischenkabel für Vergaser

Title (fr)

Cable intermédiaire pour carburateurs

Publication

EP 0924413 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98500273 A

Priority

ES 9702606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924413A2] "INTERMEDIATE CABLE FOR CARBURETTORS" of the type used in motorcycles and mopeds characterised in that said intermediate cable has a connection head (2) in its lower end which is attached to the carburettor cylinder and on the other end has a female connector (3) for the traditional cable, being encased in a metal support tube (4) with a fixed end screw (6) to be joined to a tensor or sliding cover (7) and placing between the metal support tube (4) and the intermediate cable (1) a plastic protective covering (5) for the cable (1), while the traditional cable connected directly to the accelerator lever is provided with a male connection head (9) to join it to the female head (3) of intermediate cable (1), and having in its end a cover stop with an elastic ring (8) of the sliding cover (7). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/02 (2006.01); F16C 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924413 A2 19990623; EP 0924413 A3 20000510; EP 0924413 B1 20021106; AT 227395 T 20021115; DE 69809180 D1 20021212; ES 2147502 A1 20000901; ES 2147502 B1 20010301; JP H11247833 A 19990914; TW 430824 B 20010421

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-07 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030207

2003-02-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809180 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001109

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227395 T 20021115

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-17 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20001109

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI