Global patent index - EP 0924417 A3

EP 0924417 A3 2000-10-18 - Transient injection quantity control apparatus and method of diesel engine

Title (en)

Transient injection quantity control apparatus and method of diesel engine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Übergangseinspritzmenge eines Dieselmotors

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour commander la quantité d'injection en phase transitoire d'un moteur diesel

Publication

EP 0924417 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98123368 A

Priority

JP 35368197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924417A2] Even in the course of executing smoothing process of fuel injection quantity of a diesel engine (1), the increase in a basic fuel injection quantity is switched to the increased quantity having a smaller increase rate depending on an accelerator opening degree and a driver's request for deceleration so as to improve drivability by intensifying the response to the driver's request for acceleration. As a result, even in the course of executing the acceleration smoothing control, the acceleration can be suppressed in quick response to the driver's request for deceleration to be immediately satisfied, resulting in excellent drivability. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/10; F02D 41/12; F02D 41/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/12 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3827 (2013.01); F02D 41/10 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0406 (2013.01); F02D 2200/0606 (2013.01); F02D 2250/21 (2013.01); F02D 2250/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] US 5014672 A 19910514 - FUJII TAKAAKI [JP], et al
  • [A] US 5427072 A 19950627 - UDO HIROSHI [JP]
  • [PA] DE 19802843 A1 19980730 - DENSO CORP [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 139 (M - 387) 14 June 1985 (1985-06-14)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 008, no. 240 (M - 336) 6 November 1984 (1984-11-06)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 457 (M - 1181) 20 November 1991 (1991-11-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 158 (M - 393) 3 July 1985 (1985-07-03)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924417 A2 19990623; EP 0924417 A3 20001018; EP 0924417 B1 20040818; DE 69825714 D1 20040923; DE 69825714 T2 20050811; JP 3341665 B2 20021105; JP H11182294 A 19990706

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061208

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061208

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2005-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051201

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-04-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69825714

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030408

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981210

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI