Global Patent Index - EP 0924436 A3

EP 0924436 A3 2000-02-23 - Fan casing

Title (en)

Fan casing

Title (de)

Lüftergehäuse

Title (fr)

Boîtier d' un ventilateur

Publication

EP 0924436 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830730 A

Priority

IT MC970027 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924436A2] This invention relates to a fan for gas boilers with proof combustion, comprising a centrifuge rotor housed inside a spiral made up of two die-cast aluminum semi-shells, of which one is externally provided with a bracket for the support and centering of the motor-rotor assembly made from one die cast piece together with its semi-shell. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 29/02; F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/4226 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F04D 29/703 (2013.01); F05D 2230/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924437 A2 19990623; EP 0924437 A3 20000223; DE 69823318 D1 20040527; DE 69823318 T2 20050504; EP 0924436 A2 19990623; EP 0924436 A3 20000223; EP 0924436 B1 20040421; IT 238513 Y1 20001113; IT MC970027 U1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121203

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69823318

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101203

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101203

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110104

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20090401

2006-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LN DI NATALINI LINO & C. S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20060202

2006-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LN 2 S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20060202

2006-06-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-06-02 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2006-06-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-03-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-12-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051203

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050124

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823318 P 20040527

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030416

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 29/42 A, 7F 04D 29/02 B, 7F 04D 29/66 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI