Global Patent Index - EP 0924437 A3

EP 0924437 A3 2000-02-23 - Fan casing with condensate collection and drainage

Title (en)

Fan casing with condensate collection and drainage

Title (de)

Lüftergehäuse mit Kondensatansammlung und Ableitung

Title (fr)

Boîtier d'un ventilateur avec collecteur du condensat et drainage

Publication

EP 0924437 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98830731 A

Priority

IT MC970027 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924436A2] This invention relates to a fan for gas boilers with proof combustion, comprising a centrifuge rotor housed inside a spiral made up of two die-cast aluminum semi-shells, of which one is externally provided with a bracket for the support and centering of the motor-rotor assembly made from one die cast piece together with its semi-shell. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 29/70; F24H 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/4226 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F04D 29/703 (2013.01); F05D 2230/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924437 A2 19990623; EP 0924437 A3 20000223; DE 69823318 D1 20040527; DE 69823318 T2 20050504; EP 0924436 A2 19990623; EP 0924436 A3 20000223; EP 0924436 B1 20040421; IT 238513 Y1 20001113; IT MC970027 U1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030110

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 29/42 A, 7F 04D 29/70 B, 7F 24H 8/00 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI