Global Patent Index - EP 0924445 A3

EP 0924445 A3 2000-02-23 - Spring support

Title (en)

Spring support

Title (de)

Federunterlage

Title (fr)

Support de ressort

Publication

EP 0924445 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121790 A

Priority

DE 29722552 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924445A2] The upper mounting of a coil spring suspension, and the lower mounting for the damper, are fitted with elastomer support plates to give an elastic support. Each plate is made of moulded elastomer and is reinforced by a plastics insert plate around which the elastomer is moulded. The plastics plate is made from moulded plastics granules and has a central metal cup (7) to locate the central part of the suspension strut. radial recesses in the moulding form drainage ducts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16F 1/32 (2006.01); F16F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16F 1/32 (2013.01); F16F 3/12 (2013.01); B60G 2202/12 (2013.01); B60G 2202/143 (2013.01); B60G 2204/124 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29722552 U1 19980219; EP 0924445 A2 19990623; EP 0924445 A3 20000223; EP 0924445 B1 20030226; ES 2191247 T3 20030901

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071116

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061117

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061117

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061116

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191247 T3

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807303 P 20030403

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2002-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRELLEBORG AUTOMOTIVE TECHNICAL CENTRE GMBH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 16F 1/12 A

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI