Global Patent Index - EP 0924468 B1

EP 0924468 B1 2002-09-11 - Electric glow plug for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Electric glow plug for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Elektrisch beheizbare Glühkerze oder Glühstab für Verbrennungsmotoren

Title (fr)

Bougie électrique à incandescence pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0924468 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123342 A

Priority

DE 19756988 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924468A2] An internal combustion engine electric heater plug or rod (1) has an oxygen getter material within its metal sheath. An internal combustion engine electric heater plug or rod (1) consists of a sealed corrosion resistant metal sheath (7) which contains, in addition to a conductive coil (8) embedded in a nonconductive compacted powder filling (10), a getter material for gettering oxygen present in the filling. Preferred Features: The oxygen getter material is present as particles distributed within the filling and/or as a coating on the coil (8) or the sheath interior surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924468 A2 19990623; EP 0924468 A3 19990922; EP 0924468 B1 20020911; DE 19756988 C1 19990902; US 6043459 A 20000328; US 6121577 A 20000919

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051208

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041208

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-12-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041208

2003-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031205

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-02 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031202

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805497 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-05-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

1999-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990825

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI