Global Patent Index - EP 0924470 A3

EP 0924470 A3 2001-03-14 - Premix combustor for a gas turbine

Title (en)

Premix combustor for a gas turbine

Title (de)

Vormischbrennkammer für eine Gasturbine

Title (fr)

Chambre de combustion à prémélange pour turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 0924470 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123199 A

Priority

  • DE 19756663 A
  • DE 19810648 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924470A2] The combustion chamber has a main combustion zone and a downstream post-combustion zone. At least one premix chamber issues tangentially producing swirl in the combustion chamber. Also incorporated is a pilot stage with a pilot injection device. The main combustion zone (3) runs in the combustion chamber (9) runs coaxially to the post-combustion zone (5). The pilot stage (4) is arranged at the end of the combustion chamber remote from the post-combustion zone (5). At least one premix chamber (6) is formed as a rectangular channel. Its height is low in relation to its length and width. Its outlet end is so arranged in relation to the combustion chamber that the flow entering the combustion chamber has a maximum eccentricity to the longitudinal axis (M) of the combustion chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/28; F23R 3/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/30 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01); F23R 3/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/343 (2013.01); F23R 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924470 A2 19990623; EP 0924470 A3 20010314; EP 0924470 B1 20030618; JP H11248159 A 19990914; US 6202420 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071205

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808754 P 20030724

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23R 3/28 A, 7F 23R 3/42 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI