Global patent index - EP 0924478 A3

EP 0924478 A3 2000-03-22 - Refrigeration system with integrated oil cooling heat exchanger

Title (en)

Refrigeration system with integrated oil cooling heat exchanger

Title (de)

Kälteanlage mit eingegliedertem Wärmetauscher zur Ölkühlung

Title (fr)

Système frigorifique avec échangeur de chaleur intégré pour le refroidissement d'huile

Publication

EP 0924478 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98630074 A

Priority

  • US 99158897 A
  • US 99422497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924478A2] The refrigeration system includes a substantially liquid refrigerant and an evaporator (22) for transferring heat from the air to the substantially liquid refrigerant. The substantially liquid refrigerant becomes a low temperature, low pressure first substantially gaseous refrigerant. A compressor (12) compresses the first substantially gaseous refrigerant into a high pressure, high temperature superheated second gaseous refrigerant. A lubricant circuit supplies lubricant to the compressor (12). A condenser (16) rejects heat from the second gaseous refrigerant and forms a high pressure, lower temperature sub-cooled liquid refrigerant. The condenser (16) has an output stream. A metering device (20) transforms the sub-cooled liquid refrigerant into the substantially liquid refrigerant for the evaporator (22). A heat exchanger (18) includes a coolant circuit for circulating coolant in a first coolant path on route to the compressor (12); a lubricant circuit (51) for circulating lubricant in a second lubricant path on route to said compressor (12) for cooling via heat exchange with said coolant, and a refrigerant circuit (49) for circulating said sub-cooled liquid refrigerant in a third refrigerant path on route to the metering device (20) for cooling via heat exchange with said coolant. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 1/00; F25B 5/02; F25B 31/00; F25B 40/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 31/00 (2006.01); F25B 40/00 (2006.01); F25B 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 43/006 (2013.01); F25B 31/002 (2013.01); F25B 40/00 (2013.01); F25B 2400/051 (2013.01); F25B 2400/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924478 A2 19990623; EP 0924478 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030226

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 25B 1/00 A, 7F 25B 5/02 B, 7F 25B 31/00 B, 7F 25B 40/00 B, 7F 25B 43/00 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI