Global Patent Index - EP 0924483 A3

EP 0924483 A3 2001-01-03 - Lighting switching device for refrigerators

Title (en)

Lighting switching device for refrigerators

Title (de)

Schaltvorrichtung für Beleuchtungseinrichtungen in Kühlgeräten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation de l'éclairage pour des réfrigérateurs

Publication

EP 0924483 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123977 A

Priority

ES 9702642 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924483A2] The internal lighting used in a refrigerator is operated by a switch that is in a unit fixed (11) by a bracket (4) to the main housing (2) by a threaded bolt (3). The switch is activated by a bolt (5) that is inserted into a holder that fits into the door (9). The end has a profiled section (10) that engages the switch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 27/00; E05D 11/00; H01H 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/00 (2006.01); F25D 27/00 (2006.01); H01H 3/16 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/00 (2013.01); F25D 27/00 (2013.01); H01H 3/162 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/106 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/31 (2013.01); F25D 23/028 (2013.01); F25D 2700/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924483 A2 19990623; EP 0924483 A3 20010103; ES 2134741 A1 19991001; ES 2134741 B1 20000501

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI