Global Patent Index - EP 0924487 B1

EP 0924487 B1 2001-02-14 - Vacuum drying of semiconductor material

Title (en)

Vacuum drying of semiconductor material

Title (de)

Vakuumtechnisches Trocknen von Halbleiterbruch

Title (fr)

Séchage à vide de matériau semi-conducteur

Publication

EP 0924487 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124206 A

Priority

DE 19756830 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924487A2] After the final washing stage the silicon grains are placed, in a perforated container, in a heated vacuum tight vessel of VA-2 or VA-4 steel, which is electro-polished or coated with a clean room compatible temperature resistant material, e.g. silicon, Teflon or PFA. A cycle of evacuation and flooding the vessel with extremely pure air with a relative humidity of less than 20% or a pure inert gas is repeated several times.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/04 (2006.01); H01L 21/304 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924487 A2 19990623; EP 0924487 A3 19990707; EP 0924487 B1 20010214; DE 19756830 A1 19990701; JP H11265875 A 19990928; US 6170171 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800476 20010322

2001-02-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE IT

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981217

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI