Global Patent Index - EP 0924580 A4

EP 0924580 A4 2000-07-05 - MACHINE FOR PRODUCTION OF AN ORIGINAL WATCH AND AN ORIGINAL DIAL FOR WATCHES

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR PRODUCTION OF AN ORIGINAL WATCH AND AN ORIGINAL DIAL FOR WATCHES

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ORIGINELLEN UHR UND EINES ORIGINELLEN UHRZIFFERBLATTES

Title (fr)

MACHINE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE MONTRE ORIGINALE ET D'UN CADRAN ORIGINAL POUR MONTRES

Publication

EP 0924580 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98911127 A

Priority

  • JP 9801469 W
  • JP 10672197 A
  • JP 8809898 A
  • US 30956899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924580A1] An original design watch or original design dial for a watch manufacturing machine in accordance with a design information inputted by a customer to apply promptly its demand. The design information inputted by the customer through an input apparatus (2, 102) is transferred to a manufacturing apparatus (14, 114) and utilized as a command for operation and a design pattern to be drawn. The manufacturing apparatus (14, 114) chooses a housing assembly (20) or a dial plate (120) in accordance with the operational command of the design information, and prints the designed pattern of drawing, picture, photograph or character given by the customer on the dial in accordance with the design information. Then, the dial (120), watch hands and a cover glass are furnished onto the housing assembly (20) in accordance with the selection specified by the design information. The completed watch is sold by an automatic vending machine or by a sales person in usual manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 19/06; G04B 19/10; G04B 39/00; G04D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04D 3/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04D 3/0002 (2013.01); G04D 3/0092 (2013.01); G07F 17/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0924580 A1 19990623; EP 0924580 A4 20000705; WO 9845762 A1 19981015

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1019097

2002-09-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020718

2000-07-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 04B 19/06 A, 7G 04B 19/10 B, 7G 04B 39/00 B, 7G 04D 1/08 B, 7G 04D 1/00 B, 7G 04D 3/00 B, 7G 07F 11/70 B, 7G 04D 3/06 B

2000-07-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-06-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990104

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB