Global patent index - EP 0924640 A3

EP 0924640 A3 2000-10-11 - Adapter for contacting of smart cards

Title (en)

Adapter for contacting of smart cards

Title (de)

Adapter zum Kontaktieren von Chipkarten

Title (fr)

Adaptateur pour le contact de cartes à puce

Publication

EP 0924640 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122337 A

Priority

DE 29722142 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924640A2] The adapter has identical upper and lower housing sections (1,5) consisting of two separate panels coupled together via an intermediate frame element holding them at the required relative spacing. The housing conforms in size and shape to a standard chip card (4). The chip card is received between the upper and lower sections of the housing via an insertion slit at one end of the housing. At the opposite end of the housing is a connection terminal field. The terminal is coupled to a printed circuit board extending parallel to the inserted chip card, with contact elements for contacting the chip card.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06K 17/00 (2006.01); H01R 12/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/0021 (2013.01); Y10S 439/945 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29722142 U1 19980212; EP 0924640 A2 19990623; EP 0924640 A3 20001011; EP 0924640 B1 20050518; JP 2000003416 A 20000107; US 6272017 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151125

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151125

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151125

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59812806

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812806

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STOCKO CONTACT GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06K 7/00 A

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI