Global Patent Index - EP 0924712 A3

EP 0924712 A3 2000-09-20 - Markings support for electrical conductor

Title (en)

Markings support for electrical conductor

Title (de)

Bezeichnungsträger für elektrische Leiter

Title (fr)

Porte-repères pour conducteur électrique

Publication

EP 0924712 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121683 A

Priority

DE 29722178 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0924712A2] A label carrier for electrical conductors has an upper half-shell (1) placed on the conductor (4) that has a label-mounting surface (5) and a lower half-shell (2) enclosing the conductor that is pivoted to the other half-shell by a film hinge(3). At the free ends of the half-shells are catches (6,7) to hold them closed. The device has a clamping strap or clip (11), to compensate for the conductor diameter, integrated into the filmic hinge, and it projects into the conductor space, with each end moulded into the two half-shells. The catch at the free end of the lower half-shell is tangential.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/36; G09F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/368 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 5115586 A 19920526 - HAWKER MICHAEL J [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29722178 U1 19980219; AT 289113 T 20050215; EP 0924712 A2 19990623; EP 0924712 A3 20000920; EP 0924712 B1 20050209

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141113

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 289113 T

- Effective date: 20141113

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-05-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812555 P 20050317

2005-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040113

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01B 7/36 A, 7G 09F 3/04 B

1999-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI